home
***
CD-ROM
|
disk
|
FTP
|
other
***
search
/
CD-ROM Now 11
/
CD-ROM Now MegaDisc 11 (1995-02).iso
/
discs
/
space
/
ast_form.txt
< prev
next >
Wrap
Text File
|
1994-10-26
|
28KB
|
670 lines
"6_3_2_5.TXT" (27427 bytes) was created on 07-07-92
SHORT BIOGRAPHICAL SKETCHES OF FORMER ASTRONAUTS
SOURCE: Information Summaries
Astronaut Fact Book
February, 1992
ALDRIN, Buzz, Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
7Born January 20, 1930, in Montclair, New Jersey.
Bachelor of science in mechanical engineering from U.S. Military
Academy; doctorate of science in astronautics from Massachusetts
Institute of Technology.
Flew on Gemini 12 and Apollo 11.
Currently lecturing and consulting on space sciences, Starcraft
Enterprises. Resides in southern California.
ALLEN, Joseph P., Civilian
Born June 27, 1937, in Crawfordsville, Indiana.
Bachelor of arts in mathematics and physics from DePauw University;
master of science and doctorate of philosophy in physics from Yale
University.
Flew on STS-5 and STS 51-A.
Currently President and Chief Executive Officer, Space Industries
International Inc., Houston, Texas.
ANDERS, William A., Major General, U.S. Air Force Reserve (Retired)
Born October 17, 1933, in Hong Kong.
Bachelor of science in nuclear engineering from U.S. Naval Academy;
master of science in nuclear engineering from Air Force Institute of
Technology.
Flew on Apollo 8.
Currently Chairman and Chief Executive Officer of General Dynamics
Corporation, St. Louis, Missouri.
ARMSTRONG, Neil A., Civilian
Born August 5, 1930, in Wapakoneta, Ohio.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from Purdue
University; master of science in aerospace engineering from University
of Southern California.
Flew on Gemini 8 and Apollo 11.
Currently with CTA, Inc., Charlottesville, Virginia.
BEAN, ALAN L., Captain, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born March 15, 1932, in Wheeler, Texas.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from University of
Texas.
Flew on Apollo 12 and Skylab 3.
Currently devotes his time to creating paintings which serve as an
artistic record of Project Apollo and of humankind's first exploration
of other worlds and our moon.
BOBKO, Karol J., Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Pilot.
Born December 23, 1937, in New York, New York.
Bachelor of science from U.S. Air Force Academy; master of science in
aerospace engineering from University of Southern California.
Flew on STS-6, STS 51-D and STS 51-J.
Currently with Booz, Allen & Hamilton, Inc., Houston, Texas.
BORMAN, Frank, Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born March 14, 1928, in Gary, Indiana.
Bachelor of science from U.S. Military Academy; master of science in
aeronautical engineering from California Institute of Technology.
Flew on Gemini 7 and Apollo 8.
Currently Vice Chairman, Texas Air, Houston, Texas. Also, Chairman
and Chief Executive Officer, Patlex Corporation, Las Cruces, New
Mexico.
BRIDGES, Roy D., Jr., Brigadier General, U.S. Air Force
Born July 19, 1943, in Atlanta, Georgia.
Bachelor of science in engineering science from U.S. Air Force
Academy; master of science in astronautics from Purdue University.
Flew on STS 51-F.
Currently Deputy Chief of Staff for Test and Resources, Headquarters
Air Force Systems Command, Andrews Air Force Base, Maryland.
BULL, John S., Civilian
Born September 25, 1934, in Memphis, Tennessee.
Bachelor of science in mechanical engineering from Rice University;
master of science and doctorate of philosophy in aeronautical
engineering from Stanford University.
Currently provides technical and management consulting services to
research and development programs.
CARPENTER, M. Scott, Commander, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born May 1, 1925, in Boulder, Colorado.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from University of
Colorado.
Flew on Mercury 7.
CARR, Gerald P., Colonel, U.S. Marine Corps (Retired)
Born August 22, 1932, in Denver, Colorado.
Bachelor of science in mechanical engineering from University of
Southern California; bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering
from U.S. Naval Postgraduate School; master of science in aeronautical
engineering from Princeton University.
Flew on Skylab 4.
Currently President, CAMUS, Inc., Huntsville, Arkansas.
CERNAN, Eugene A., Captain, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born March 14, 1934, in Chicago, Illinois.
Bachelor of science in electrical engineering from Purdue University;
master of science in aeronautical engineering from U.S. Navy
Postgraduate School.
Flew on Gemini 9, Apollo 10 and Apollo 17.
Currently heads The Cernan Corporation, Houston, Texas, and is
Director, Marketing Development-Government/Aerospace for Digital
Equipment Corporation.
CHAPMAN, Philip K., Civilian
Born March 5, 1935, in Melbourne, Australia.
Bachelor of science in physics and mathematics from University of
Sydney; master of science in aeronautics and astronautics and
doctorate of science in instrumentation from Massachusetts Institute
of Technology.
Currently with Arthur D. Little, Inc., Cambridge, Massachusetts.
CLEAVE, Mary L., Civilian
Mission specialist.
Born February 5, 1947, in Southampton, New York.
Bachelor of science in biological sciences from Colorado State
University; master of science in microbial ecology and doctorate of
philosophy in civil and environmental engineering from Utah State
University.
Flew on STS 61-B and STS-30.
Currently assigned to environmental issues in the Laboratory for
Hydrospheric Processes, NASA Goddard Space Flight Center, Greenbelt,
Maryland.
COATS, Michael L., Captain, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Pilot.
Born January 16, 1946, in Sacramento, California. Hometown Riverside,
California.
Bachelor of science from U.S. Naval Academy; master of science in
administration of science and technology from George Washington
University; master of science in aeronautical engineering from U.S.
Naval Postgraduate School.
Flew on STS 41-D, STS-29, and STS-39.
Currently Director, Advanced Programs and Technical Planning, Loral
Space Information Systems Houston.
COLLINS, Michael, Major General, U.S. Air Force Reserve (Retired)
Born October 31, 1930, in Rome, Italy.
Bachelor of science from U.S. Military Academy.
Flew on Gemini 10 and Apollo 11.
Currently President, Michael Collins Associates, Washington, D.C.
CONRAD, Charles, Jr., Captain, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born June 2, 1930, in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from Princeton
University.
Flew on Gemini 5, Gemini 11, Apollo 12 and Skylab 2.
Currently Staff Vice President for International Business Development,
McDonnell Douglas Space Systems Co., Huntington Beach, California.
COOPER, L. Gordon, Jr., Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born March 6, 1927, in Shawnee, Oklahoma.
Bachelor of science from U.S. Air Force Institute of Technology;
doctorate of science in aeronautical engineering from Oklahoma City
University.
Flew on Mercury 9 and Gemini 5.
Currently President, Galaxy Group, Inc., Van Nuys, California.
CRIPPEN, Robert L., Captain, U.S. Navy
Born September 11, 1937, in Beaumont, Texas.
Bachelor of science in aerospace engineering from University of Texas.
Flew on STS-1, STS-7, STS 41-C, and STS 41-G.
Currently Director, Kennedy Space Center, Florida.
CUNNINGHAM, Walter, Colonel, U.S. Marine Corps Reserve (Retired)
Born March 16, 1932, in Creston, Iowa.
Bachelor and master of arts in physics from University of California
at Los Angeles. Advanced management program, Harvard Graduate School
of Business.
Flew on Apollo 7.
Currently President, Acorn Ventures, Inc. and Managing General
Partner, The Genesis Fund, Houston, Texas.
DUKE, Charles M., Jr., Brigadier General, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born October 3, 1935, in Charlotte, North Carolina.
Bachelor of science in naval sciences from U.S. Naval Academy; master
of science in aeronautics from Massachusetts Institute of Technology.
Flew on Apollo 16.
Currently heads Duke Investments and is President of Charlie Duke
Enterprises, Inc.
ENGLAND, Anthony W., Civilian
Born May 15, 1942, in Indianapolis, Indiana.
Bachelor and master of science in Earth sciences from Massachusetts
Institute of Technology; doctorate of philosophy in geophysics from
Massachusetts Institute of Technology.
Flew on STS 51-F.
Currently Professor of Electrical Engineering and Computer Science at
the University of Michigan, Ann Arbor, Michigan.
ENGLE, Joe H., Major General, Air National Guard
Born August 26, 1932, in Dickinson County, Kansas.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from University of
Kansas.
Flew 16 flights in USAF/NASA X-15 - 3 flights into space; flew on
Space Shuttle approach and landing tests 2 and 4, STS-2 and STS 51-I.
Currently Air National Guard Assistant to CINC, U.S. Space Command;
maintains currency in F-16 ANG aircraft; also aerospace and sporting
goods consultant.
FABIAN, John M., Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born January 28, 1939, in Goosecreek, Texas.
Bachelor of science in mechanical engineering from Washington State
University; master of science in aerospace engineering from U.S. Air
Force Institute of Technology; doctorate of philosophy in aeronautics
and astronautics from University of Washington.
Flew on STS-7 and STS 51-G.
Currently Executive Vice President, Analytic Services Inc. (ANSER),
Arlington, Virginia.
FISHER, William F., Civilian
Mission specialist.
Born April 1, 1946, in Dallas, Texas.
Bachelor of arts from Stanford University; master of science in
engineering from University of Houston; doctorate of medicine from
University of Florida.
Flew on STS 51-I.
Currently practicing medicine full-time at Humana Hospital, Clear Lake
City, Texas.
FULLERTON, Charles G., Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born October 11, 1936, in Rochester, New York.
Bachelor and master of science in mechanical engineering from
California Institute of Technology.
Flew Space Shuttle approach and landing tests 1, 3 and 5; STS-3 and
STS 51-F.
Currently Research Pilot, NASA Dryden Flight Research Facility,
Edwards Air Force Base, California.
GARDNER, Dale A., Captain, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born November 8, 1948, in Fairmont, Minnesota.
Bachelor of science in engineering physics from University of
Illinois. Flew on STS-8 and STS 51-A.
Currently Senior Systems Engineer with TRW, Inc., Colorado Springs,
Colorado.
GARDNER, Guy S., Colonel, U.S. Air Force
Pilot.
Born January 6, 1948, in Alta Vista, Virginia.
Bachelor of science in engineering sciences, astronautics and
mathematics from U.S. Air Force Academy; master of science in
astronautics from Purdue University.
Flew on STS-27 and STS-35.
Currently Commandant, USAF Test Pilot School, Edwards Air Force Base,
California.
GARRIOTT, Owen K., Civilian
Born November 22, 1930, in Enid, Oklahoma.
Bachelor of science in electrical engineering from University of
Oklahoma; master of science and doctorate of philosophy in electrical
engineering from Stanford University.
Flew on Skylab 3 and STS-9.
Currently Vice President of Space Programs, Teledyne Brown
Engineering, Huntsville, Alabama.
GIBSON, Edward G., Civilian
Born November 8, 1936, in Buffalo, New York.
Bachelor of science in engineering from University of Rochester;
master of science in engineering from California Institute of
Technology; doctorate of philosophy in engineering and physics from
California Institute of Technology.
Flew on Skylab 4.
Currently Principal, Booz, Allen and Hamilton Inc., Reston, Virginia.
GLENN, John H., Jr., Colonel, U.S. Marine Corps (Retired)
Born July 18, 1921, in Cambridge, Ohio.
Bachelor of science in engineering from Muskingum College.
Flew on Mercury 6.
Currently U.S. Senator from Ohio.
GORDON, Richard F., Jr., Captain, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born October 5, 1929, in Seattle, Washington.
Bachelor of science in chemistry from University of Washington. Flew
on Gemini 11 and Apollo 12.
Currently President, Astro Science Corporation, Los Angeles,
California.
GRAVELINE, Duane F., Civilian
Born March 2, 1931, in Newport, Vermont.
Bachelor of science and doctorate of medicine from University of
Vermont; master of science in public health from Johns Hopkins
University.
HAISE, Fred W., Jr., Civilian
Born November 14, 1933, in Biloxi, Mississippi.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from University of
Oklahoma.
Flew on Apollo 13 and Space Shuttle approach and landing tests 1, 3
and 5.
Currently President of Space Station Program Support Division, Grumman
Corporation, Reston, Virginia.
HART, Terry J., Civilian
Born October 27, 1946, in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
Bachelor of science from Lehigh University; master of science in
mechanical engineering from Massachusetts Institute of Technology;
master of science in electrical engineering from Rutgers University;
honorary doctorate of engineering from Lehigh University.
Flew on STS 41-C.
Currently Head, Cellular Systems Business and Technology Planning
Department, A T & T Bell Laboratories, Whippany, New Jersey.
HAUCK, Frederick H., Captain, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born April 1, 1941, in Long Beach, California.
Bachelor of science in physics from Tufts University; master of
science in nuclear engineering from Massachusetts Institute of
Technology.
Flew on STS-7, STS 51-A and STS-26.
Currently President, International Technology Underwriters, Bethesda,
Maryland.
HAWLEY, Steven A., Civilian
Mission specialist.
Born December 12, 1951, in Ottawa, Kansas.
Bachelor of arts in physics and astronomy from University of Kansas;
doctorate of philosophy in astronomy and astrophysics from University
of California at Santa Cruz.
Flew on STS 41-D, STS 61-C, and STS-31.
Currently Associate Director of NASA Ames Research Center, Moffett
Field, California.
HENIZE, Karl G., Civilian
Born October 17, 1926, in Cincinnati, Ohio.
Bachelor of arts in mathematics from University of Virginia; master of
arts in astronomy from University of Virginia; doctorate of philosophy
in astronomy from University of Michigan.
Flew on STS 51-F.
Currently a Senior Scientist in the Space Science Branch, Space and
Life Sciences Directorate, NASA Lyndon B. Johnson Space Center,
Houston, Texas.
HOLMQUEST, Donald L., Civilian
Born April 7, 1939, in Dallas, Texas.
Bachelor of science in electrical engineering from Southern Methodist
University; doctorate of philosophy in physiology and doctorate of
medicine from Baylor University; juris doctor from University of
Houston.
Currently a partner in the law firm of Holmquest and Associates,
Houston, Texas.
KERWIN, Joseph P., Captain, Medical Corps, U.S. Navy
Born February 19, 1932, in Oak Park, Illinois.
Bachelor of arts in philosophy from College of the Holy Cross;
doctorate of medicine from Northwestern University Medical School.
Flew on Skylab 2.
Currently Manager, Manned Systems Programs, Lockheed Missiles & Space
Company, Houston, Texas.
LENOIR, William B., Civilian
Born March 14, 1939, in Miami, Florida.
Bachelor of science, master of science and doctorate of philosophy in
electrical engineering from Massachusetts Institute of Technology.
Flew on STS-5.
Currently Associate Administrator of Space Flight, NASA Headquarters,
Washington, DC.
LIND, Don L., Civilian
Born May 18, 1930, in Midvale, Utah.
Bachelor of science in physics from University of Utah; doctorate of
philosophy in high energy nuclear physics from University of
California at Berkeley.
Flew on STS 51-B.
Currently professor of physics, Utah State University, Logan, Utah.
LLEWELLYN, John A., Civilian
Born April 22, 1933, in Cardiff, Wales.
Bachelor of science and doctorate of philosophy in chemistry from
University College at Cardiff.
Currently professor and Director of Engineering Computing, University
of South Florida at Tampa.
LOUNGE, John M., "Mike," Civilian
Mission specialist.
Born June 28, 1946, in Denver, Colorado. Hometown Burlington,
Colorado.
Bachelor of science in physics and mathematics from U.S. Naval
Academy; master of science in astrogeophysics from University of
Colorado.
Flew on STS 51-I, STS-26, and STS-35.
Currently Director of Houston Operations for Spacehab, Inc.
LOUSMA, Jack R., Colonel, U.S. Marine Corps (Retired)
Born February 29, 1936, in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from University of
Michigan; degree of aeronautical engineer from U.S. Naval Postgraduate
School.
Flew on Skylab 3 and STS-3.
Currently President, Consortium for International Earth Science
Information Network (CIESIN), Ann Arbor, Michigan.
LOVELL, James A., Jr., Captain, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born March 25, 1928, in Cleveland, Ohio.
Bachelor of science from U.S. Naval Academy; Advanced Management
Program, Harvard Business School.
Flew on Gemini 7, Gemini 12, Apollo 8 and Apollo 13.
Currently President, Lovell Communications, Chicago, Illinois.
MATTINGLY, Thomas K., II, Captain, U.S. Navy
Born March 17, 1936, in Chicago, Illinois.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from Auburn
University.
Flew on Apollo 16, STS-4 and STS 51-C.
Currently Director, Utilization and Operation, Grumman Space Station
Program Support Division, Reston, Virginia.
McBRIDE, Jon A., Captain, U.S. Navy
Born August 14, 1943, in Charleston, West Virginia.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from U.S. Naval
Postgraduate School.
Flew on STS 41-G.
Currently President and Chief Executive Officer, Flying Eagle Corp.,
Lewisburg, West Virginia.
McCANDLESS, Bruce, II, Captain, U.S. Navy
Born June 8, 1937, in Boston, Massachusetts.
Bachelor of science from U.S. Naval Academy; master of science in
electrical engineering from Stanford University; master of science in
business administration from University of Houston-Clear Lake.
Flew on STS 41-B and STS-31.
Currently on the staff of Martin Marietta Astronautics Group, Denver,
Colorado.
McCULLEY, Michael J., Captain, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Pilot.
Born August 4, 1943, in San Diego, California. Hometown Livingston,
Tennessee.
Bachelor and master of science in metallurgical engineering from
Purdue University.
Flew on STS-34.
Currently Vice President and Launch Site Deputy Director, Lockheed
Space Operations Company at Kennedy Space Center, Florida.
McDIVITT, James A., Brigadier General, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born June 10, 1929, in Chicago, Illinois.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from University of
Michigan.
Flew on Gemini 4 and Apollo 9.
Currently Senior Vice President, Government and International
Operations, Rockwell International Corporation, Washington, DC.
MICHEL, F. Curtis, Civilian
Born June 5, 1934, in LaCrosse, Wisconsin.
Bachelor of science and doctorate of philosophy in physics from
California Institute of Technology.
Currently Andrew Hays Buchanan Professor of Astrophysics, Department
of Space Physics and Astronomy, Rice University, Houston, Texas.
MITCHELL, Edgar D., Captain, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born September 17, 1930, in Hereford, Texas.
Bachelor of science in industrial management from Carnegie Institute
of Technology (now Carnegie-Mellon University); bachelor of science in
aeronautical engineering from the U.S. Naval Postgraduate School;
doctorate of science in aeronautics and astronautics from
Massachusetts Institute of Technology.
Flew on Apollo 14.
MULLANE, Richard M., Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Mission specialist.
Born September 10, 1945, in Wichita Falls, Texas.
Bachelor of science in military engineering from U.S. Military
Academy; master of science in aeronautical engineering from U.S. Air
Force Institute of Technology.
Flew on STS 41-D, STS-27, and STS-36.
Currently self-employed in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
NELSON, George D., Civilian
Born July 13, 1950, in Charles City, Iowa.
Bachelor of science in physics from Harvey Mudd College; master of
science and doctorate of philosophy in astronomy from University of
Washington.
Flew on STS 41-C, STS 61-C and STS-26.
Currently Assistant Provost and Associate Professor of Astronomy,
University of Washington, Seattle, Washington.
O'CONNOR, Bryan D., Colonel, U.S. Marine Corps
Pilot.
Born September 6, 1946, in Orange, California. Hometown Twentynine
Palms, California.
Bachelor of science in engineering from U.S. Naval Academy; master of
science in aeronautical systems from West Florida University.
Flew on STS 61-B and STS-40.
Currently Commander, Marine Air Detachment, Naval Air Test Center,
Patuxent River, Maryland.
O'LEARY, Brian T., Civilian
Born January 27, 1940, in Boston, Massachusetts.
Bachelor of arts in physics from Williams College; master of arts in
astronomy from Georgetown University; doctorate of philosophy in
astronomy from University of California at Berkeley.
Currently Chairman, Board of Directors, Institute for Security and
Cooperation in Outer Space.
OVERMYER, Robert F., Colonel, U.S. Marine Corps (Retired)
Born July 14, 1936, in Lorain, Ohio.
Bachelor of science in physics from Baldwin Wallace College; master of
science in aeronautics from U.S. Naval Postgraduate School.
Flew on STS-5 and STS 51-B.
Currently Staff Director, Flight Crew Suitability, Space Station
Division, McDonnell Douglas Space Systems Co.
PARKER, Robert A. R., Civilian
Mission specialist.
Born December 14, 1936, in New York City, New York.
Bachelor of arts in astronomy and physics from Amherst College;
doctorate of philosophy in astronomy from California Institute of
Technology.
Flew on STS-9 and STS-35.
Currently Director, Policy and Plans, Office of Space Flight, NASA
Headquarters, Washington, D.C.
PETERSON, Donald H., Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born October 22, 1933, in Winona, Mississippi.
Bachelor of science from U.S. Military Academy; master of science in
nuclear engineering from U.S. Air Force Institute of Technology.
Graduate of Air Force Test Pilot School and War College.
Flew on STS-6.
Currently President, Aerospace Operations Consultants, Inc.
POGUE, William R., Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born January 23, 1930, in Okemah, Oklahoma.
Bachelor of science in education from Oklahoma Baptist University;
master of science in mathematics from Oklahoma State University.
Flew on Skylab 4.
Currently technical services contractor to aerospace firms, Space
Station Program.
RIDE, Sally K., Civilian
Born May 26, 1951, in Los Angeles, California.
Bachelor of science in physics; bachelor of arts in English; master of
science and doctorate of philosophy in physics from Stanford
University.
Flew on STS-7 and STS 41-G.
Currently professor of physics at University of California, San Diego,
and Director, California Space Institute.
ROOSA, Stuart A., Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born August 16, 1933, in Durango, Colorado.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from University of
Colorado.
Flew on Apollo 14.
Currently owner and President, Gulf Coast Coors, Gulfport,
Mississippi.
SCHIRRA, Walter M., Jr., Captain, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born March 12, 1923, in Hackensack, New Jersey.
Bachelor of science from U.S. Naval Academy; graduate of U.S. Naval
Test Pilot School.
Flew on Mercury 8, Gemini 6 and Apollo 7.
SCHMITT, Harrison H., Civilian
Born July 3, 1935, in Santa Rita, New Mexico. Hometown Santa Rita,
New Mexico.
Bachelor of science from California Institute of Technology; doctorate
of philosophy in geology from Harvard University.
Flew on Apollo 17.
Currently business and technical consultant, Albuquerque, New Mexico.
SCHWEICKART, Russell L., Civilian
Born October 25, 1935, in Neptune, New Jersey.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from Massachusetts
Institute of Technology; master of science in aeronautics and
astronautics from Massachusetts Institute of Technology.
Flew on Apollo 9.
Currently President, NRS Communications, Inc., Sausalito, California.
SCOTT, David R., Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born June 6, 1932, in San Antonio, Texas.
Bachelor of science from U.S. Military Academy; master of science in
aeronautics and astronautics from Massachusetts Institute of
Technology.
Flew on Gemini 8, Apollo 9 and Apollo 15.
Currently President, Scott Science and Technology, Inc., Lancaster,
California.
SHAW, Brewster H., Jr., Colonel, U.S. Air Force
Born May 16, 1945, in Cass City, Michigan.
Bachelor and master of science in engineering mechanics from
University of Wisconsin.
Flew on STS-9, STS 61-B and STS-28.
Currently Deputy Director, Space Shuttle, NASA Headquarters, stationed
at NASA John F. Kennedy Space Center, Florida.
SHEPARD, Alan B., Jr., Rear Admiral, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born November 18, 1923, in East Derry, New Hampshire. Bachelor of
science from U.S. Naval Academy.
Flew on Mercury 3 and Apollo 14.
Currently President, Seven Fourteen Enterprises, Houston, Texas.
SLAYTON, Donald K., Major, U.S. Air Force Reserve
Born March 1, 1924, in Sparta, Wisconsin.
Bachelor of science in aeronautical engineering from University of
Minnesota.
Flew on Apollo-Soyuz Test Project.
Currently Director, Space Services Division, EER Systems, Houston,
Texas.
SPRING, Sherwood C., Colonel, U.S. Army
Born September 3, 1944, in Hartford, Connecticut.
Bachelor of science in general engineering from U.S. Military Academy;
master of science in aerospace engineering from University of Arizona.
Flew on STS 61-B.
Currently Director, U.S. Army Space Program Office, Fairfax, Virginia.
SPRINGER, Robert C., Colonel, U.S. Marine Corps (Retired)
Mission specialist.
Born May 21, 1942, in St. Louis, Missouri.
Bachelor of science in naval science from U.S. Naval Academy; master
of science in operations research and systems analysis from U.S. Naval
Postgraduate School.
Flew on STS-29 and STS-38.
Currently Manager, Space Station Freedom, Element Integration, Boeing
Aerospace and Electronics Division, Huntsville, Alabama.
STAFFORD, Thomas P., Lieutenant General, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born September 17, 1930, in Weatherford, Oklahoma.
Bachelor of science from U.S. Naval Academy.
Flew on Gemini 6, Gemini 9, Apollo 10 and Apollo-Soyuz Test Project.
Currently Vice Chairman, Stafford, Burke and Hecker, Inc., Alexandria,
Virginia.
STEWART, Robert L., Brigadier General, U.S. Army
Born August 13, 1942, in Washington, DC.
Bachelor of science in mathematics from Southern Mississippi
University; master of science in aerospace engineering from University
of Texas at Arlington.
Flew on STS 41-B and STS 51-J.
Currently Director of Plans, U.S. Space Command, Petersen AFB,
Colorado.
TRULY, Richard H., Vice Admiral, U.S. Navy (Retired)
Born November 12, 1937, in Fayette, Mississippi.
Bachelor of aeronautical engineering from Georgia Institute of
Technology.
Flew on Space Shuttle approach and landing tests 2 and 4, STS-2 and
STS-8.
Currently NASA Administrator, Washington, D.C.
van HOFTEN, James D. A., Civilian
Born June 11, 1944, in Fresno, California.
Bachelor of science in civil engineering from University of California
at Berkeley; master of science in hydraulic engineering and doctorate
of philosophy in fluid mechanics from Colorado State University.
Flew on STS 41-C and STS 51-I.
Currently Senior Vice President and Manager of the Defense and Space
Business Line, Bechtel National, Inc., San Francisco, California.
WILLIAMS, Donald E., Captain, U.S. Navy
Pilot.
Born February 13, 1942, in Lafayette, Indiana.
Bachelor of science in mechanical engineering from Purdue University.
Flew on STS 51-D and STS-34.
Currently Senior Systems Engineer, Science Applications International
Corp.
WORDEN, Alfred M., Colonel, U.S. Air Force (Retired)
Born February 7, 1932, in Jackson, Michigan.
Bachelor of science in military science from U.S. Military Academy;
master of science in astronautical and aeronautical engineering and
instrumentation engineering from University of Michigan.
Flew on Apollo 15.
Currently President, Jet Electronics and Technology, Inc., Grand
Rapids, Michigan.